Financial history HAVEN IN ROMANIA

Charity Number: 1051365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.20k £17.96k £23.73k £13.42k £34.43k
Total expenditure £24.00k £28.41k £25.11k £26.64k £32.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A