Financial history WANZA SAMAJ U.K.

Charity Number: 1051458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.53k £17.60k £5.11k £18.99k £23.59k
Total expenditure £16.45k £5.76k £6.09k £17.00k £22.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A