Accounts and annual returns HOPE CORNER

Charity number: 1051787
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 23 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 23 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 09 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 09 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 13 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 February 2007 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 23 February 2007 23 days late