Financial history SOUTH SHIELDS VOLUNTEER LIFE BRIGADE

Charity number: 1052343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.87k £30.11k £42.83k £17.19k £24.00k
Total expenditure £19.04k £21.61k £29.02k £23.94k £14.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.61k £10.26k £2.60k £1.55k £8.20k