Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF STAPLEGROVE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 November 2023 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 October 2021 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 September 2020 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required