Accounts and annual returns HUTTON RUDBY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1052930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 February 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 February 2024 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 March 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 March 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window