Financial history HUTTON RUDBY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1052930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.39k £10.78k £57.46k £60.76k £6.89k
Total expenditure £51.78k £16.62k £43.37k £98.44k £7.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A