Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MANEA SCHOOL

Charity number: 1053244
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 02 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2008 12 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 22 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 18 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 16 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required