Financial history FRIENDS OF MANEA SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1053244
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008 31/10/2009
Total gross income £1.56k £805 £990 £848 £0
Total expenditure £2.28k £1.70k £1.07k £1.29k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A