Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF DUNMOW CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1053540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.99k £11.37k £17.49k £319.20k £72.77k
Total expenditure £18.28k £10.91k £18.30k £19.98k £109.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £200 N/A N/A