Financial history EALING MENCAP

Charity number: 1054061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.16m £2.18m £1.58m £1.74m £1.81m
Total expenditure £2.18m £1.87m £1.64m £1.82m £1.94m
Income from government contracts £525.74k £743.86k £454.69k £548.78k £595.06k
Income from government grants £915.94k £871.98k £823.80k £911.58k £905.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.31k £5.59k £7.33k £9.57k £3.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.14m £2.17m £1.57m £1.73m £1.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.68k £4.72k £4.07k £4.15k £4.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.18m £1.87m £1.64m £1.82m £1.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £46.54k £49.23k £5.40k £6.00k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0