Financial history POLICE SUMMER CAMP PROJECT

Charity number: 1054219
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £4.05k £3.97k £6.07k £4.45k £2.10k
Total expenditure £7.26k £8.06k £8.25k £7.55k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A