Financial history EMMANUEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1054370
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £199.67k £264.82k £272.53k £225.69k £222.58k
Total expenditure £177.97k £147.96k £176.16k £210.89k £193.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A