Financial history COED CAE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1055340
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £93.34k £120.36k £60.21k £53.45k £114.12k
Total expenditure £89.15k £116.11k £62.43k £58.26k £99.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A