Financial history HARROGATE SHOPMOBILITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1055898
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009
Total gross income £4.13k £4.58k £6.14k £4.61k £4.93k
Total expenditure £7.77k £7.22k £6.65k £7.09k £6.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A