Financial history NORWICH AND NORFOLK MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/02/2020 03/02/2021 03/02/2022 03/02/2023 03/02/2024
Total gross income £43.10k £45.37k £51.87k £54.27k £53.52k
Total expenditure £32.33k £21.22k £35.85k £36.09k £43.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.81k £20.03k N/A N/A