Accounts and annual returns WEAR SURMA 75 PROJECT

Charity number: 1057270
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2022 02 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required