Financial history WEAR SURMA 75 PROJECT

Charity number: 1057270
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £5.05k £2.97k £3.78k £3.38k £5.62k
Total expenditure £5.59k £5.00k £3.50k £5.50k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A