Financial history TYNEMOUTH VILLAGE DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1057489
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £140.66k £127.70k £116.27k £109.81k £96.47k
Total expenditure £135.75k £131.62k £132.70k £127.36k £118.85k
Income from government contracts £67.28k £46.73k £14.96k £49.93k £38.18k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A