Financial history JOHN SMITH TRUST

Charity number: 1057885
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £496.73k £931.91k £1.15m £421.98k £312.21k
Total expenditure £496.52k £869.22k £1.08m £530.33k £295.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £327.69k £291.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £889.17k £1.10m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £41.00k £44.46k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £1.74k £4.99k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £847.97k £1.05m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £12.35k £13.80k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A