Accounts and annual returns SELBY AND DISTRICT D I A L

Charity number: 1058185
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 07 February 2019 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 07 February 2019 160 days late
Annual return 31 October 2016 04 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 04 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2015 26 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 26 January 2016 On Time