Financial history SELBY AND DISTRICT D I A L

Charity number: 1058185
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £86.59k £72.43k £41.55k £33.44k £4.44k
Total expenditure £74.94k £79.96k £55.51k £41.96k £16.86k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £5.02k £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.40k £20.60k £26.48k N/A