Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. MONICA'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1059399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £70.51k £41.95k £32.99k £39.94k £52.29k
Total expenditure £60.50k £62.13k £22.38k £29.48k £69.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A