Financial history BRITISH CHINESE ARTISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059823
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £25.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £19.09k £852 £852 £350 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A