Accounts and annual returns THE ARIEL TRUST (DEVON)

Charity number: 1059874
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 04 June 2014 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 04 June 2014 674 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 09 December 2011 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required