Financial history THE ARIEL TRUST (DEVON)

Charity number: 1059874
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £15 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A