Financial history MALABAR INDEPENDENT SYRIAN CHURCH SUPPORT CHARITY

Charity number: 1059966
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £983 £651 £663 £788 £364
Total expenditure £72 £623 £1.61k £72 £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A