Accounts and annual returns THE FOREST STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL UK WORKING GROUP

Charity number: 1060072
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2009 17 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 29 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2008 20 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 26 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2007 03 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 03 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2006 18 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 18 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 13 October 2005 On Time