Financial history THE FOREST STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL UK WORKING GROUP

Charity number: 1060072
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2005 28/02/2006 28/02/2007 29/02/2008 30/04/2009
Total gross income £181.97k £275.48k £135.01k £315.15k £221.46k
Total expenditure £209.57k £238.37k £195.37k £324.52k £199.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A