Accounts and annual returns THE PHILOS TRUST

Charity number: 1060126
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 22 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 29 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 29 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 17 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 17 January 2009 78 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 20 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required