Financial history THE PHILOS TRUST

Charity number: 1060126
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £8.59k £7.35k £10.06k £13.14k £7.15k
Total expenditure £7.96k £6.86k £9.41k £12.06k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A