Accounts and annual returns KNAPHILL CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1060278
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2014 16 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 14 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2013 16 December 2014 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 14 December 2014 105 days late
Annual return 31 October 2012 13 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 19 August 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2011 07 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 07 August 2012 On Time