Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF SANDRINGHAM SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1060500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required