Financial history THE FRIENDS OF SANDRINGHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1060500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £15.11k £5.55k £14.92k £13.86k £15.76k
Total expenditure £12.66k £11.42k £15.29k £5.93k £18.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.50k