Accounts and annual returns THE RUSSIAN CONVOY CLUB (NORTH WALES BRANCH) WELFARE FUND

Charity Number: 1060533
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 15 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 15 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required