Accounts and annual returns SOUTHAMPTON INSTITUTE EDUCATIONAL COMPANY

Charity number: 1060598
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 30 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 14 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2007 11 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 19 May 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2006 23 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 18 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2005 26 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 07 June 2006 7 days late
Annual return 31 July 2004 15 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 15 April 2005 On Time