Financial history SOUTHAMPTON INSTITUTE EDUCATIONAL COMPANY

Charity Number: 1060598
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2004 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008
Total gross income £408.65k £408.61k £408.35k £408.68k £408.09k
Total expenditure £411.89k £406.98k £407.04k £407.04k £429.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A