Accounts and annual returns NORTHAMPTONSHIRE CROSSROADS CARE SCHEME LIMITED

Charity number: 1060621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 16 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 23 February 2007 23 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 17 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 12 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 12 November 2004 On Time