Financial history NORTHAMPTONSHIRE CROSSROADS CARE SCHEME LIMITED

Charity number: 1060621
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £427.00k £402.02k £444.79k £373.39k £334.59k
Total expenditure £436.38k £426.11k £412.54k £402.31k £337.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A