Accounts and annual returns RUSHEY GREEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1060996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 November 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2023 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 April 2022 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 April 2022 530 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required