Accounts and annual returns THOMAS JOHNSON'S LIDLINGTON CHARITY

Charity number: 200519
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 20 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 01 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 22 November 2010 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required