Financial history THOMAS JOHNSON'S LIDLINGTON CHARITY

Charity Number: 200519
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £854 £890 £874 £2.95k £888
Total expenditure £841 £741 £34 £900 £115
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A