Financial history WINTERTON (NORFOLK) TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 207082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £918 £567 £567 £485 £706
Total expenditure £870 £710 £710 £500 £460
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A