Accounts and annual returns MIGRAINE ACTION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 207783
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 22 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required