Financial history FETHERSTONHAUGH RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity number: 208200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/02/2020 19/02/2021 19/02/2022 19/02/2023 19/02/2024
Total gross income £369 £280 £824 £337 £1.89k
Total expenditure £0 £35 £0 £30 £2.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A