Accounts and annual returns THE WRAY, JACKENETT, MERRILL & ELIE TRUST

Charity number: 208324
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 19 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 11 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 13 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 February 2006 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time