Governing document THE WRAY, JACKENETT, MERRILL & ELIE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 3 MAY 1971, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 5 JUNE 1984 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND DEED DATED 9 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 14 MARCH 2007, AND DEED DATED 30 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO POOR PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF HOLY TRINITY AND ST MARY THE GREAT WITH ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS. THE TRUSTEES MAY, WHEN THERE IS A VACANCY IN ONE OR MORE OF THE ALMSHOUSES, APPOINT ALMSPEOPLE NOT RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BUT OTHERWISE QUALIFIED. SO FAR AS POSSIBLE, THOSE APPOINTED FROM OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHOULD EITHER RESIDE IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE OR HAVE RELATIVES RESIDING IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF CAMBRIDGE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.