Accounts and annual returns BRIGHTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 209698
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 April 2007 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 11 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 03 March 2005 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required