Financial history KINGSTON SOCIETY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES

Charity Number: 210583
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/03/2017
Total gross income £24.08k £15.80k £12.67k £29.55k £80.50k
Total expenditure £29.64k £33.89k £37.28k £28.06k £35.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.73k £0