Accounts and annual returns THE LUCY BRANGWYN HOMES

Charity number: 210846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 August 2024 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required